Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dorival Souza Barreto Júnior

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Tyndaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1964 Born
19 Jul 198723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Montes Claros, Brazil
10 Mar 198823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Montes Claros, Brazil
4 Nov 202056.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
4 Nov 202056.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tyndaris
3 Jan 202156.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tyndaris

MicroData Summary for Dorival Souza Barreto Júnior
Father Dorival Souza Barreto Júnior (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJequié
Ordained PriestNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Montes Claros, Diocese of Montes Claros

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2020
  • od/ob/c01: CB, 4 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast