Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otacilio Francisco Ferreira de Lacerda

Bishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1960 Born
10 Apr 198827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Dec 201656.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Dec 201656.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
18 Mar 201756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana
19 Jun 201958.5AppointedBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Sep 201958.8InstalledBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Otacilio Francisco Ferreira de Lacerda
Bishop Otacilio Francisco Ferreira de Lacerda (born ) Bishop of Guanhães

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapiruçu, Diocese of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Aparecida, Archdiocese of Aparecida, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guanhães.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2016
  • c2: CB, 17 Mar 2017
  • c34: CB, 18 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,349
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2019
  • i: CB, 19 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Jun 2019

Quantcast