Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Bergese

Deceased

Archbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1935Born
1 Dec 196328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Feb 198145.4AppointedBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Apr 198145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 May 199155.6AppointedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Jun 199155.7InstalledArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Mar 199660.5DiedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Bergese
Archbishop João Bergese (born , died ) Archbishop of Pouso Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavigliano

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018