Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Júlio César Gomes Moreira

Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Thisiduo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1972 Born
6 Dec 200331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
23 Dec 202048.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Dec 202048.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
13 Feb 202148.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thisiduo

MicroData Summary for Júlio César Gomes Moreira
Bishop Júlio César Gomes Moreira (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Brasília, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 23 Dec 2020
  • c2+: CB, 21 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast