Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulo Cezar Costa

Archbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1967 Born
27 Dec 199124.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
5 Dec 199225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201043.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201043.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
5 Feb 201143.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
22 Jun 201648.9AppointedBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Aug 201649.0InstalledBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 202053.2AppointedArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Cezar Costa (VIAF: 64253224)
Archbishop Paulo Cezar Costa (born ) Archbishop of Brasília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValença
Ordained PriestNossa Senhora da Glória, Cathedral, Valença, Diocese of Valença, Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brasília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,944
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 12
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2016
  • i: CB, 22 Jun 2016
  • c1: CB, 14 Oct 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Oct 2020

Quantcast