Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ubiratan Lopes, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1947 Born
28 Dec 197528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Nov 199952.1AppointedBishop of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Feb 200052.4Ordained BishopBishop of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Ubiratan Lopes
Bishop José Ubiratan Lopes O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Itaguaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItambacuri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itaguaí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,700
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast