Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gianni Danzi

Deceased

Prelate of Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1940Born
17 Dec 196626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
18 Jun 199454.3AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
1 Feb 199555.0AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
2 May 199656.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castello
24 May 199656.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castello
2000¹59.9ResignedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
22 Feb 200161.0AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
22 Feb 200565.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Loreto, Italy
9 Apr 200565.2InstalledPrelate of Loreto, Italy
2 Oct 200767.6DiedPrelate of Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianni Danzi
(VIAF: 35984496; WikiData: Q1522591)
Archbishop Gianni Danzi (born , died ) Prelate of Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViggiù, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBarasso, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Viggiù, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,753
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 7 Jul 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 Jul 2023