Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (João) Risatti, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1942Born
22 Dec 196725.0ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
23 Jun 196825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
10 Dec 198745.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
21 Feb 198845.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Jul 198946.6SucceededBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
20 Jan 199350.1AppointedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
9 Sep 200360.7DiedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (João) Risatti
Bishop Giovanni (João) Risatti P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Macapá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Italy

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,715
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018