Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arcângelo Cerqua, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1917Born
29 Jun 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
15 Mar 195639.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Feb 196144.0AppointedPrelate of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Feb 196144.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Olbia
14 May 196144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olbia
26 May 197861.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Olbia
30 Oct 198063.8AppointedBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Jul 198972.5ResignedBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
16 Feb 199073.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Arcângelo Cerqua
Bishop Arcângelo Cerqua P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parintins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiugliano di Campania, Italy

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018