Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aristide Pirovano, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1915Born
20 Dec 194126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
14 Jan 195034.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
21 Jul 195540.4AppointedPrelate of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
21 Jul 195540.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum
13 Nov 195540.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum
27 Mar 196550.0ResignedPrelate of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
27 Mar 196550.0AppointedSuperior General of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1977²61.8ResignedSuperior General of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
3 Feb 199781.9DiedPrelate Emeritus of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aristide Pirovano
Bishop Aristide Pirovano P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Macapá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErba, Italy

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018