Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Altevir da Silva, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Cametá, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1962 Born
18 Nov 198927.1Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Dec 199230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 Sep 201754.9AppointedBishop of Cametá, Para, Brazil
16 Dec 201755.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cametá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Altevir da Silva
Bishop José Altevir da Silva C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Cametá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIpixuna, Territorial Prelature of Juruá, Acre
Ordained BishopCametá, Diocese of Cametá, Para

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cametá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 10 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Dec 2017