Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nelson Francelino Ferreira

Bishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1965 BornSapé
4 Aug 199025.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201045.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201045.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alava
5 Feb 201145.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alava
12 Feb 201449.0AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Nelson Francelino Ferreira:
Bishop Nelson Francelino Ferreira (born ) Bishop of Valença

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valença.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,943
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 11
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014