Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Décio Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1940Born
22 Jan 196726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Săo Paulo, Brazil
2 Apr 197938.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Săo Paulo, Brazil
2 Apr 197938.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Martirano
27 May 197939.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martirano
21 May 199757.0AppointedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Feb 200362.8DiedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Décio Pereira
Bishop Décio Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Santo André

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSăo Paulo, Archdiocese of Săo Paulo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,919

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast