Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Marchió

Bishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1943 Born
29 Jun 196824.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 199147.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
29 Jun 199147.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
26 May 199349.7SucceededBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
6 Nov 200259.1AppointedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Marchió
Bishop Bernardino Marchió (born ) Bishop of Caruaru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusca, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caruaru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,640

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast