Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evaldo Carvalho dos Santos, C.M.

Bishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1969 Born
27 Sep 199526.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jan 199828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
20 Feb 201949.9AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
27 Apr 201950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
18 May 201950.1InstalledBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Evaldo Carvalho dos Santos
Bishop Evaldo Carvalho dos Santos C.M. (born ) Bishop of Viana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 20 Feb 2019
  • c2+: CB, 21 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 27 Apr 2019

Quantcast