Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ângelo Pignoli

Bishop of Quixadá, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1946 BornCappella Picenardi, Italy
19 Mar 197629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Jan 200760.1AppointedBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
11 Mar 200760.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil
25 Mar 200760.3InstalledBishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ângelo Pignoli:
Bishop Ângelo Pignoli (born ) Bishop of Quixadá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quixadá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013