Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Aparecido Gonçalves de Almeida

Auxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Enera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1960 Born
21 Dec 198626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 May 201352.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
8 May 201352.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Enera
13 Jul 201352.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Enera

MicroData Summary for José Aparecido Gonçalves de Almeida
Bishop José Aparecido Gonçalves de Almeida (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brasília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOurinhos

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brasília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 20 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018