Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeová Elias Ferreira

Bishop of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1961 Born
30 Nov 199130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
27 May 202058.7AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
22 Aug 202058.9Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
13 Sep 202059.0InstalledBishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jeová Elias Ferreira
Bishop Jeová Elias Ferreira (born ) Bishop of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSobral, Diocese of Sobral, Ceara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brasília, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goiás.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 9 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 17 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Aug 2020

Quantcast