Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo José Bueno Miele

Deceased

Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1923BornSão Bernardo do Campo
8 Dec 195027.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 196239.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Nov 196239.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
10 Feb 196339.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
25 Jan 196743.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jan 196743.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Uppenna
12 Jul 197248.8SucceededArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Dec 198158.3DiedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bernardo José Bueno Miele:
Archbishop Bernardo José Bueno Miele (born , died ) Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013