Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albano Bortoletto Cavallin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Londrina, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1930Born
6 Dec 195323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
14 Jun 197343.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
14 Jun 197343.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
28 Aug 197343.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
24 Oct 198656.4AppointedBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
11 Mar 199261.8AppointedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
10 May 200676.0RetiredArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
1 Feb 201786.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Londrina, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Albano Bortoletto Cavallin
Archbishop Albano Bortoletto Cavallin (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Londrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLapa
Death PlaceHospital Evangélico, Londrina, Archdiocese of Londrina, Parana

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2006
  • d: CB, 1 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Feb 2017