Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Agostinho Marochi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1925Born
6 Dec 195328.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 197348.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
27 Sep 197348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
6 Dec 197348.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
2 Feb 197650.4AppointedBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Feb 200276.4RetiredBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jan 201892.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Agostinho Marochi
Bishop Antônio Agostinho Marochi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Largo da Piedade
Death PlacePresidente Prudente, Diocese of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of São Sebastião, Cathedral, Presidente Prudente, Diocese of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast