Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo Fernandes Bijos, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1913Born
25 Oct 193623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Nov 195643.7AppointedBishop of Londrina, Brazil
13 Jan 195743.9Ordained BishopBishop of Londrina, Brazil
24 Nov 197057.8AppointedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
28 Mar 198269.1DiedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Fernandes Bijos
Archbishop Geraldo Fernandes Bijos C.M.F. (born , died ) Archbishop of Londrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelo Horizonte

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Feb 2017