Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo José Nolker, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paranaguá, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1912BornBaltimore, MD, USA
2 Aug 193421.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Jun 193926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Jan 196350.2AppointedBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
25 Apr 196350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
15 Mar 198976.4RetiredBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
17 Jan 200087.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bernardo José Nolker:
Bishop Bernardo José Nolker C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paranaguá

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015