Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Joseph Donahue

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Medea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1893BornNew York
25 May 191824.4Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
5 Mar 193440.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
5 Mar 193440.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
1 May 193440.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
3 May 197278.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
17 Aug 198288.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Joseph Donahue:
Bishop Stephen Joseph Donahue (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015