Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Aloisio Niedhammer y Yaeckle, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Caloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1901Born
8 Jun 192725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 May 194341.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
11 May 194341.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caloe
29 Jun 194341.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caloe
25 Jun 197068.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Matteo Aloisio Niedhammer y Yaeckle
Bishop Matteo Aloisio Niedhammer y Yaeckle O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, USA

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast