Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pozzoni, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Titular Bishop of Tavium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1861Born
10 Jul 188220.5ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1 Mar 188523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
12 Jul 190543.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
12 Jul 190543.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tavium
1 Oct 190543.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tavium
20 Feb 192462.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pozzoni
Bishop Domenico Pozzoni P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaderno d'Adda, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopHong Kong, Vicariate Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Death PlaceHong Kong, Vicariate Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,905, Number 41
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 511, Ascendance
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast