Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sibomana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1915BornSave
25 Jul 194025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kabgayi, Rwanda
21 Aug 196146.3AppointedBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
3 Dec 196146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
5 Sep 196954.4AppointedBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
30 Mar 199276.9RetiredBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
9 Nov 199984.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kibungo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sibomana:
Bishop Joseph Sibomana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,752
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013