Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ruzindana

Deceased

Bishop of Byumba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1943BornRambura
23 Jul 197229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Byumba, Rwanda
5 Nov 198138.4AppointedBishop of Byumba, Rwanda
17 Jan 198238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Byumba, Rwanda
8 Jun 199451.0DiedBishop of Byumba, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ruzindana:
Bishop Joseph Ruzindana (born , died ) Bishop of Byumba

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013