Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslas Kalibushi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1919BornByimana
25 Jul 194728.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 197657.4AppointedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
27 Mar 197757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
2 Jan 199777.5RetiredBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
20 Dec 199778.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nyundo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Wenceslas Kalibushi:
Bishop Wenceslas Kalibushi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013