Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Harolimana

Bishop of Ruhengeri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1962 BornMpembe
8 Sep 199028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nyundo, Rwanda
31 Jan 201249.4AppointedBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
24 Mar 201249.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Vincent Harolimana:
Bishop Vincent Harolimana (born ) Bishop of Ruhengeri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruhengeri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • ob: CB, 16 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 24 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,277
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013