Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NoŽl Mala

Deceased

Bishop of Kasongo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1901BornBaudouinville
14 Aug 193231.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 196361.9AppointedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 196362.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Jul 196463.2DiedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for NoŽl Mala:
Bishop NoŽl Mala (born , died ) Bishop of Kasongo

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015