Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Creemers, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1907Born
1 Aug 193326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
1 Jan 195547.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Jan 195547.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Belabitene
11 Apr 195548.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belabitene
10 Nov 195952.6AppointedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 197063.4ResignedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 197063.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
23 Sep 197164.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for André Creemers
Bishop André Creemers O.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinrooi, Belgium

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018