Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurits Gerard De Keyzer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}

Titular Bishop of Tinum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1906BornEmelgem
16 Aug 193125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
24 Apr 196256.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
24 Apr 196256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
11 Jun 196256.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
8 Sep 198781.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
19 Jan 199487.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Maurits Gerard De Keyzer:
Bishop Maurits Gerard De Keyzer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013