Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Louis Descamps

Deceased

Secretary of the Pontifical Biblical Commission

Titular Bishop of Tunes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1916Born
5 Oct 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 196044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunes
3 Nov 196044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Dec 196044.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunes
1964²47.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
21 Mar 197356.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
15 Oct 198064.3DiedSecretary of the Pontifical Biblical Commission

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert Louis Descamps
Bishop Albert Louis Descamps (born , died ) Secretary of Pontifical Biblical Commission

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEscanaffles

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast