Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aníbal Nieto Guerra, O.C.D.

Bishop of San Jacinto de Yaguachi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1949 BornFormaselle, Spain
197525.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Aug 198233.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
10 Jun 200657.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
10 Jun 200657.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscania
22 Jul 200657.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscania
4 Nov 200960.7AppointedBishop of San Jacinto de Yaguachi, Ecuador
27 Feb 201061.0InstalledBishop of San Jacinto de Yaguachi, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Aníbal Nieto Guerra:
Bishop Aníbal Nieto Guerra O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of San Jacinto de Yaguachi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jacinto de Yaguachi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,209
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013