Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcos Aurelio Pérez Caicedo

Archbishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1967 BornDaule
19 Mar 199224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guayaquil, Ecuador
10 Jun 200638.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
10 Jun 200638.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
22 Jul 200639.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
10 Feb 201244.5AppointedBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
14 Sep 201346.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guaranda, Ecuador
15 Aug 201447.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Guaranda, Ecuador
20 Jun 201648.9AppointedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Marcos Aurelio Pérez Caicedo
Archbishop Marcos Aurelio Pérez Caicedo (born ) Archbishop of Cuenca

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cuenca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,210
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2012
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016