Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Bolivar Piedra Aguirre

Auxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Maronana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1965 Born
24 Mar 199024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
20 May 201953.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
20 May 201953.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronana
6 Jul 201953.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronana

MicroData Summary for José Bolivar Piedra Aguirre
Bishop José Bolivar Piedra Aguirre (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNabón, Archdiocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopCuenca, Archdiocese of Cuenca

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cuenca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 21 May 2019
  • c23: CB, 3 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast