Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Skiper Bladimir Yáńez Calvachi

Bishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1972 Born
29 Jun 199624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
24 Jun 201442.3AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
15 Aug 201442.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
27 Mar 201846.1AppointedBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
19 May 201846.2InstalledBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Skiper Bladimir Yáńez Calvachi
Bishop Skiper Bladimir Yáńez Calvachi (born ) Bishop of Babahoyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMachachi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guaranda, Diocese of Guaranda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Babahoyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2014
  • ob: CB, 15 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 17 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,266
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2018
  • i: CB, 29 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast