Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Anibal Altamirano Argüello

Deceased

Bishop of Azogues


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1942BornAloasí
29 Jun 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
3 Jan 199451.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
3 Jan 199451.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
20 Feb 199451.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
14 Feb 200461.9AppointedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
25 Sep 201573.5DiedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Carlos Anibal Altamirano Argüello:
Bishop Carlos Anibal Altamirano Argüello (born , died ) Bishop of Azogues

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,252
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015