Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armido Gasparini, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Awasa, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Magnetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1913Born
17 Apr 193824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
16 Feb 197359.4AppointedPrefect of Awasa, Ethiopia
15 Mar 197965.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnetum
15 Mar 197965.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia
27 May 197965.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnetum
20 Dec 199380.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia
21 Oct 200491.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Awasa, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Armido Gasparini (VIAF: 47086479)
Bishop Armido Gasparini F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Awasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLizzano in Belvedere, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,914

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Sep 2020

Quantcast