Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan González Núñez, M.C.C.I.

Apostolic Administrator of Awasa, Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1944 Born
1964²19.2EnteredMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
1968²23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
29 Sep 202075.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Awasa, Ethiopia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan González Núñez
Father Juan González Núñez M.C.C.I. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Awasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChandrexa de Queixa, Diocese of Orense, Spain
Ordained PriestValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast