Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Ángel Cardinal Ayuso Guixot, M.C.C.I.

President of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue

Cardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1952 Born
2 May 198027.8Perpetual VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
20 Sep 198028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
30 Jun 201260.0AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
29 Jan 201663.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
19 Mar 201663.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana
25 May 201966.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
5 Oct 201967.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia
5 Oct 201967.3Elevated to Cardinal
8 Feb 202067.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ángel Ayuso Guixot (VIAF: 81311154)
Miguel Ángel Cardinal Ayuso Guixot M.C.C.I. (born ) President of Interreligious Dialogue

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Ordained PriestCorpus Christi, Church, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Feb 2016
  • c3+: CB, 19 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,868
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2019
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cdea: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 4 Feb 2020

Quantcast