Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorino Girardi Stellin, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Tilarán-Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1938 BornLendinaria, Italy
9 Sep 196224.5ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
30 Mar 196325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
13 Jul 200264.3AppointedBishop of Tilarán, Costa Rica
21 Sep 200264.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tilarán, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Vittorino Girardi Stellin:
Bishop Vittorino Girardi Stellin M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Tilarán-Liberia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • dname: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 736
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013