Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Buigues Oller, T.C.

Bishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1963 Born
25 Jun 198825.2Perpetual VowsMember of Capuchin Tertiary Religious of Our Lady of Sorrows
22 Apr 198926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Capuchin Tertiary Religious of Our Lady of Sorrows
1 Mar 201854.9AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
26 May 201855.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Buigues Oller
Bishop Bartolomé Buigues Oller T.C. (born ) Bishop of Alajuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeulada, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alajuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2018
  • ob: CB, 1 Mar 2018
  • c2: CB, 1 Mar 2018
  • c34: CB, 26 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast