Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Morera Vega

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tilarán, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1926Born
17 Dec 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 197953.7AppointedBishop of Tilarán, Costa Rica
27 Dec 197953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tilarán, Costa Rica
13 Jul 200276.3RetiredBishop of Tilarán, Costa Rica
23 Dec 201791.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tilarán, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Héctor Morera Vega
Bishop Héctor Morera Vega (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tilarán

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmares
Death PlaceTilarán, Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast