Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubén López Ardón

Bishop Emeritus of Esteli, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1934 Born
22 Dec 196127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Esteli, Nicaragua
2 Jan 197944.5AppointedBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
27 May 197944.9Ordained BishopBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
6 Mar 199055.7ResignedBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Rubén López Ardón
Bishop Rubén López Ardón (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Esteli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOcotal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Esteli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast