Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathai Kochuparampil, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Diphu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1939BornKanjirapally
20 Dec 196930.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Dec 198344.5AppointedBishop of Diphu, India
6 Jan 198444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Diphu, India
4 Mar 199252.7DiedBishop of Diphu, India

MicroData Summary for Mathai Kochuparampil:
Bishop Mathai Kochuparampil S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Diphu

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015