Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Patrick Devlin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1921Born
9 Dec 194524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gibraltar
20 Oct 198463.6AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
6 Jan 198563.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
14 Feb 199876.9RetiredBishop of Gibraltar
15 Dec 201089.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Bernard Patrick Devlin
Bishop Bernard Patrick Devlin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYoughal, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. John the Evangelist, Church, Portsmouth, Diocese of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast