Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Caruana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1932Born
24 May 195926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gibraltar
14 Feb 199865.3AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
24 May 199865.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
18 Mar 201077.4RetiredBishop of Gibraltar
1 Oct 201077.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Charles Caruana
Bishop Charles Caruana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Ordained PriestGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Ordained BishopSt. Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Death PlaceSt. Bernard's, Hospital, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2010
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,327
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Jun 2019

Quantcast