Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Afonso Nteka, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mbanza Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1940BornCazumbi
5 Sep 197131.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Nov 198444.6AppointedBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola
6 Jan 198544.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola
10 Aug 199151.4DiedBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Afonso Nteka:
Bishop Afonso Nteka O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Mbanza Congo

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015